WY SF0140 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0068
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state employees; generally exempting employees of the state banking division from state personnel classification and compensation provisions; requiring the state banking board to establish personnel classifications and salaries for positions within the division of banking as specified; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Banking division-classification and salary exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Adopted SF0140JC001: 41-16-3-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Adopted SF0140JC001: 24-4-2-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-26-4-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-25-0-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Suspension of the rules and referred directly to COW 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30 Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0068
2020-03-30 Veto Message Received
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0068
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0068
2020-03-12 Assigned Number SEA No. 0068
2020-03-12HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-11SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-11SenateConcur:Failed 0-26-4-0-0
2020-03-11SenateReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-11House3rd Reading:Passed 35-25-0-0-0
2020-03-10House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-09HouseCOW:Passed
2020-03-06HousePlaced on General File
2020-03-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to COW
2020-03-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-03-05Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
2020-03-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-04SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-04SenateSuspension of the rules and referred directly to COW 26-4-0-0-0
2020-03-03SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-03-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback