WY SF0140 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; amending provisions related to satellite manufacturer's permits; clarifying authority of local authorities to issue satellite manufacturer's permits; making conforming amendments; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages-direct sales.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-4-2-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 104
2019-02-26 Governor Signed SEA No. 0054
2019-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0054
2019-02-21SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0054
2019-02-21 Assigned Number SEA No. 0054
2019-02-21House3rd Reading:Passed 54-4-2-0-0
2019-02-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-13HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-13HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-02-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2019-02-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-01SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-01SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback