WY SF0140 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-28 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-28 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle registration; amending registration requirements for out-of-state workers; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Out of state workers-vehicle registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-28 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-24 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-28 | Senate | Failed CoW; Indef Postponed |
2013-01-28 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/SF0140.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/SF0140.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/SF0140.htm |