WY SF0139 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to ad valorem taxation; amending provisions for perfection of tax liens; amending notice of tax lien provisions; amending the definition of "delinquent taxpayer" for purposes of liens on mineral production; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax lien enforcement-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Concur:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24 Assigned Chapter Number 141
2020-03-24 Governor Signed SEA No. 0060
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0060
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0060
2020-03-11 Assigned Number SEA No. 0060
2020-03-11SenateConcur:Passed 25-4-1-0-0
2020-03-11SenateReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-11House3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0-0
2020-03-10House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-09HouseCOW:Passed
2020-03-04HousePlaced on General File
2020-03-04HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-03-03HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2020-03-02HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-27Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2020-02-26Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-25SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-20SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0
2020-02-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback