WY SF0138 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to economic development; creating the small business innovation research matching funds program; providing for administration of the program; providing eligibility requirements under the program; providing for repayment of funds awarded under the program as specified; creating the small business innovation research matching funds account; providing rulemaking authority; providing for an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Small business innovation research-matching funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Stan Cooper [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Rep. James Byrd [D] | Rep. Samuel Krone [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 |
2015-03-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-03-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-24 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 4-3-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-23 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-23 | Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2015-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-05 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-04 | Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-28 | Bill Number Assigned |