WY SF0137 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-16-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to administration of government; authorizing incentive budgets for entities that revert appropriations as specified; specifying duties of the joint appropriations committee; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State budgeting-negotiation incentives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-16-1-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-28 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31Senate3rd Reading:Failed 13-16-1-0-0
2019-01-30Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-29SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-28SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-28SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback