WY SF0137 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the operation of motor vehicles; specifying standards for the imposition of interlock device penalties related to driving while under the influence of alcohol; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Ignition interlock devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-18 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0033 | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0033 | |
2011-02-16 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0033 | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0033 | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-09 | (H01) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-03 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-31 | (S01) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S01 | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |