WY SF0136 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Hicks and Meier. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Von Flatern. Conflicts: Senator(s) Scott Ayes 2 Nays 27 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Hicks and Meier. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Von Flatern. Conflicts: Senator(s) Scott Ayes 2 Nays 27 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water rights; requiring the state engineer to consider certain evidence in determining the source of supply for interconnected waters; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Water-source of supply.
Sponsors
Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] | Rep. Mark Semlek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Hicks and Meier. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Von Flatern. Conflicts: Senator(s) Scott Ayes 2 Nays 27 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 1 | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2011-02-01 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-28 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Bebout, Driskill, Emerich, Geis and Hicks Ayes 5 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-28 | (S05) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S05 | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/SF0136.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/SF0136.pdf |