WY SF0135 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; removing limits on the number of nursing care facility beds that can be added by a health care facility; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Limitation on nursing home beds-repeal.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Clem [R] | Rep. Chuck Gray [R] | Rep. Timothy Hallinan [R] | Rep. Mark Jennings [R] |
Sen. Tim Salazar [R] | Rep. Clark Stith [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/SF0135 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Introduced/SF0135.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Fiscal/SF0135.pdf |