WY SF0133 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to health care; creating a medical assistance buy in program; creating a medical assistance prescription drug program for insurers; requiring the department of health to conduct outreach to specified persons regarding contraceptive services and supplies; requiring the submission of a federal waiver application relating to a medical assistance buy in program; requiring specified actions relating to the expansion of medical assistance and the child health insurance program; requiring studies and reports; requiring specified actions to promote telemedicine; requiring the adoption of rules; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care access.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateS:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2019-02-01SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback