WY SF0131 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to labor and employment; specifying employer actions which constitute an unfair employment practice; prohibiting an employer from barring an employee from disclosing wage information; prohibiting an employer from requiring an employee to waive wage disclosure rights; prohibiting an employer from seeking or relying on salary history information of a prospective employee as specified; prohibiting an employer from discriminating against an employee as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workplace transparency act-2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenateS:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2021-04-07SenateS:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2021-03-19SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2021-03-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-01 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback