WY SF0130 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Assigned Chapter Number 169
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to charter schools; revising the process for approval and renewal of charter schools; providing for authorization of charter schools by a school district or the state loan and investment board; revising the operation of charter schools; authorizing fees; specifying funding; making conforming changes; repealing conflicting provisions; specifying limitations; requiring a study; requiring a report; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - Adopted SF0130JC001: 37-17-6-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Adopted SF0130JC001: 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-12-4-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22 Assigned Chapter Number 169
2021-04-22 Became Law without Signature
2021-04-07HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0074
2021-04-07SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0074
2021-04-07 Assigned Number SEA No. 0074
2021-04-06HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-04-02SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-04-02SenateConcur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0
2021-04-02SenateReceived for Concurrence
2021-04-02House3rd Reading:Passed 44-12-4-0-0
2021-04-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-31HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-30HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-30HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2021-03-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2021-03-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-03-10Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0
2021-03-09Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-08Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2021-03-05SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-05SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-05SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2021-03-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-01 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0130
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/SF0130.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Engross/SF0130.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Enroll/SF0130.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0130SW001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0130S2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0130S2002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0130HS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0130HW001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0130H3001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0130H3002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0130H3003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0130JC001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/SF0130.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Summaries/SF0130.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0130#-343
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0130#227
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0130#-716
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0130#5388
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0130#498
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0130#510
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0130#5427

Bill Comments

feedback