WY SF0127 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to regulation of traffic on highways; amending provisions relating to fleeing or attempting to elude police officers; providing a penalty; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Felony fleeing or eluding police.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Concur:Passed 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Concur:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 22-6-2-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Concur:Failed 15-15-0-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-21-4-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 73
2019-02-26 Governor Signed SEA No. 0041
2019-02-20HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0041
2019-02-19SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0041
2019-02-15 Assigned Number SEA No. 0041
2019-02-15SenateConcur:Passed 23-6-1-0-0
2019-02-15SenateConcur:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 22-6-2-0-0
2019-02-15SenateConcur:Failed 15-15-0-0-0
2019-02-14SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-14House3rd Reading:Passed 35-21-4-0-0
2019-02-13House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-12HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-08HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-08HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
2019-01-31Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-01-30Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-29SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-28SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-28SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback