WY SF0127 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 196 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to consumer protection; providing disclosure requirements for exterior storm damage repair solicitations, proposals and repair contracts; providing for cancellation of exterior storm damage repair contracts and cancellation waiver; providing remedies; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exterior residential storm damage repair contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10 Chapter No. 196 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-10 Governor Signed SEA No. 0085
2017-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0085
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0085
2017-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0085
2017-03-03SenateConcur:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
2017-03-03SenateReceived for Concurrence
2017-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0-0
2017-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-28HouseCOW:Passed
2017-02-16HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-16HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2017-02-06HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-02-03Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2017-02-02Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-01SenateCOW:Passed
2017-01-31SenatePlaced on General File
2017-01-31SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2017-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback