WY SF0126 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 173 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to water quality; requiring development of water quality standards as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water quality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 173 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0075
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0075
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0075
2015-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0075
2015-03-04SenateConcur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
2015-03-04SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-03-04House3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0
2015-03-03House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-03-02HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-24 Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-02-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2015-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-02-04Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0
2015-02-03Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-02SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-30 Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-27SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2015-01-27SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-26 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback