WY SF0125 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to property; classifying digital assets within existing laws; specifying that digital assets are property within the Uniform Commercial Code; authorizing security interests in digital assets; establishing an opt-in framework for banks to provide custodial services for digital asset property as custodians; specifying standards and procedures for custodial services under this act; clarifying the jurisdiction of Wyoming courts relating to digital assets; authorizing a supervision fee; making an appropriation; authorizing positions; specifying applicability; authorizing the promulgation of rules; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Digital assets-existing law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-2-4-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 91
2019-02-26 Governor Signed SEA No. 0039
2019-02-20HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0039
2019-02-19SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0039
2019-02-15 Assigned Number SEA No. 0039
2019-02-15SenateConcur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2019-02-14SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-14House3rd Reading:Passed 54-2-4-0-0
2019-02-13House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-12HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-11HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-02-07HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-07HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-02-01HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-31Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
2019-01-30Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-29SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-28SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-28SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback