WY SF0124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to trade and commerce; amending prohibitions against unfair trade or commerce discrimination; authorizing investigatory powers for the attorney general for antitrust claims; providing for civil penalties and additional civil remedies relating to antitrust violations as specified; amending criminal penalties for antitrust violations as specified; clarifying the applicability of manufacturing requirements to discrimination provisions; amending and repealing provisions related to the authority and duties of enforcing authorities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Defending Wyoming business-trade and commerce amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | Assigned Chapter Number 77 | |
2021-04-02 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0032 | |
2021-03-30 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0032 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0032 |
2021-03-30 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0032 | |
2021-03-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-12 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-04 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-01 | Bill Number Assigned |