WY SF0124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - COW:Failed 12-17-0-0-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public utilities; exempting contracts for self-generation of electricity from statutory provisions as specified; amending definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts for self-generated electricity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - Senate - COW:Failed 12-17-0-0-1 (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04SenateCOW:Failed 12-17-0-0-1
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-31SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2019-01-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback