WY SF0122 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-02 - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 26-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-02 - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 26-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to agriculture and livestock; establishing the Wyoming agriculture authority; specifying duties and powers of the authority; establishing a board for the authority; providing legislative findings; providing for financing of authority projects as specified; providing rulemaking authority; making a conforming amendment; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming agriculture authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Clausen [R] | Rep. John Eklund [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] |
Sen. David Kinskey [R] | Sen. Cheri Steinmetz [R] | Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 26-33-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 29-30-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Pursuant to HR 7-7 Accelerated to 3rd Reading 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 29-30-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Pursuant to HR 7-7 Accelerated to 3rd Reading 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 26-33-1-0-0 |
2021-04-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 29-30-1-0-0 |
2021-04-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Pursuant to HR 7-7 Accelerated to 3rd Reading 58-1-1-0-0 |
2021-04-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-04-01 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-1-0-0 |
2021-03-29 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-26 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2021-03-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-12 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-04 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-03 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-27 | Bill Number Assigned |