WY SF0122 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; establishing the Wyoming works program at community colleges; providing for grants for students and funding for community college technical programs approved to meet labor and economic development needs; specifying requirements for student grants and for community college program funding; providing for administration; requiring reports; reappropriating funds; specifying funding distributions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming works program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - COW:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - COW:Rescind original vote pursuant to Mason's §§ 480 to 483 Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - COW:Failed 28-31-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 176
2019-03-08 Governor Signed SEA No. 0078
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0078
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0078
2019-02-27 Assigned Number SEA No. 0078
2019-02-27SenateConcur:Passed 27-1-2-0-0
2019-02-27SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0
2019-02-26House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22HouseCOW:Passed 38-21-1-0-0
2019-02-22HouseCOW:Rescind original vote pursuant to Mason's §§ 480 to 483 Passed 38-21-1-0-0
2019-02-22HouseCOW:Failed 28-31-1-0-0
2019-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-20HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2019-01-24Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-23SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-22SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-22SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-18SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback