WY SF0122 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water development; providing that the water development program is for projects necessary for public benefit as specified; requiring commission members to disclose specified information; requiring the state engineer to maintain a list of beneficial uses of water; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Water development amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] |
Rep. Robert McKim [R] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2017-02-16 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0 |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2017-02-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-27 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |