WY SF0119 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state lands; authorizing the sale of a parcel of state lands in Grand Teton National Park to the United States Department of the Interior; providing terms for the sale; specifying termination of the authorization; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Grand Teton National Park-transfer of state lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Leland Christensen [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - H09 - Minerals:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - H09 - Minerals:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - H09 - Minerals:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2017-02-27 | House | H09 - Minerals:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2017-01-31 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-30 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-25 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |