WY SF0118 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school finance; amending provisions of the education resource block grant model; amending provisions governing transportation funding; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School finance amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2020-02-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-18 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | S04 - Education:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 28-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |