WY SF0118 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 56 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 56 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the food freedom act; authorizing sales at retail spaces maintained where homemade food is produced; requiring separation from any commercial food establishment; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Food freedom act-sales locations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 56 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0026 | |
2017-02-24 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0026 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0026 |
2017-02-22 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0026 | |
2017-02-21 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2017-02-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-14 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2017-02-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-27 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |