WY SF0118 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 187 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 187 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the personal opportunity with employment responsibilities (POWER) program; amending eligibility criteria; amending sanctions for noncompliance with a self-sufficiency plan; amending beneficiary reporting requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Personal opportunity with employment responsibilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Concur:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Concur:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Concur:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Chapter No. 187 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0081 | |
2015-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0081 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0081 |
2015-03-05 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0081 | |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Concur:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-03-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 |
2015-03-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-03-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-24 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-02-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-04 | Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-30 | :Rerefer to S10 - Labor | |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |