WY SF0117 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - COW:Failed 24-34-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - COW:Failed 24-34-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; allowing a passenger car and a truck to have the same University of Wyoming license plate number with a symbol or letter differentiating the vehicle types; and providing for an effective date.
Title
University of Wyoming car and truck license plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. William Haley [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] |
Rep. Charles Pelkey [D] | Sen. Liisa Anselmi-Dalton [D] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - COW:Failed 24-34-2-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | COW:Failed 24-34-2-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-14 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2019-02-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |