WY SF0117 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 66 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 66 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to environmental quality; authorizing the operation of specified oil and gas exploration or production wells or activities following application for a construction permit; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Air quality construction permitting.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Jim Anderson [R] | Sen. Stan Cooper [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Thomas Lockhart [R] | Rep. Mary Throne [D] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Chapter No. 66 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-03 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0023 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0023 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0023 |
2015-02-23 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0023 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-17 | Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2015-02-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-28 | Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |