WY SF0115 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 151
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to orders of protection; providing for the tolling of the effective period of an order of protection as specified; amending the duration of an extension; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Order of protection-tolling during imprisonment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 151
2019-02-28 Governor Signed SEA No. 0064
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0064
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0064
2019-02-26 Assigned Number SEA No. 0064
2019-02-25SenateConcur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
2019-02-25SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-14HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-04Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-01SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-31SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-18SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback