WY SF0115 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-7)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 141 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; expanding the felony of aggravated cruelty to animals; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Malicious cruelty to animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06 Chapter No. 141 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-06 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-06 Governor Signed SEA No. 0067
2017-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0067
2017-03-01SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0067
2017-03-01 Assigned Number SEA No. 0067
2017-02-28SenateConcur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2017-02-28SenateReceived for Concurrence
2017-02-28House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2017-02-27House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2017-02-09HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-09HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2017-02-02HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-02-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2017-01-31Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-30SenateCOW:Passed
2017-01-27SenatePlaced on General File
2017-01-27SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2017-01-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback