WY SF0114 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; creating the state budget department; transferring the budget division of the department of administration and information into the state budget department; requiring a reorganization plan; requiring appointment of a director; amending members of the financial advisory council; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State budget division-reorganization.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] |
Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Concur:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-25-0-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-25-0-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assigned Chapter Number 115 | |
2020-03-17 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0058 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0058 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0058 |
2020-03-11 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0058 | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Concur:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-11 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 35-25-0-0-0 |
2020-03-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-09 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-04 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2020-02-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-20 | Senate | S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 28-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |