WY SF0114 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to counties, cities and towns; modifying authority to impose zoning assessments; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Town and county development regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07 S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
2018-02-23SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0
2018-02-15SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback