WY SF0114 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating the crime of assault of a health care provider; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Assault of health care providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - House - H Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | Failed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-13 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-13 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-07 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-07 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2013-01-31 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-29 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-29 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-29 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-28 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-28 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to S06 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |