WY SF0113 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0062
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0062
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; expanding coverage under the Insurance Guaranty Association Act; amending time limits for filing claims under the Insurance Guaranty Association Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Insurance Guaranty Association Act-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0062 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0062 |
2013-02-22 | Assigned Number SEA0062 | |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-07 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-07 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2013-02-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |