WY SF0112 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number 53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to highways; designating the Wild Horse Highway; requiring signage; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wild Horse Highway-designation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 34-24-2-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18 Assigned Chapter Number 53
2019-02-18 Governor Signed SEA No. 0026
2019-02-15HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0026
2019-02-14SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0026
2019-02-13 Assigned Number SEA No. 0026
2019-02-13House3rd Reading:Passed 34-24-2-0-0
2019-02-12House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-11HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-08HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-08HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2019-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2019-01-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-24SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-24SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-24SenateS06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2019-01-18SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback