WY SF0110 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - COW:Failed 26-31-2-1-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - COW:Failed 26-31-2-1-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to pari-mutuel wagering; creating the horse racing industry development account; creating the pari-mutuel reserve account; providing for distribution of funds to the accounts; specifying use of funds in the accounts; authorizing grants to counties to develop and expand the horse racing industry in the state as specified; imposing duties on the state loan and investment board; providing for rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pari-mutuel events-horse racing account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - COW:Failed 26-31-2-1-0 (Y: 26 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | COW:Failed 26-31-2-1-0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-05 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 26-3-1-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-13 | Bill Number Assigned |