WY SF0109 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming gaming commission; prohibiting gaming or pari-mutuel commission members and staff from pursuing, investing or being engaged in commission regulated activities; repealing a duplicative provision; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming gaming commission-board member conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | COW:S Did not consider for COW |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-02-23 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 30-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-15 | Bill Number Assigned |