WY SF0108 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to courts; requiring fees for transcripts, records and other papers issued by a court reporter to be set by rule of the district court judicial conference; repealing court reporter fees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Court reporter fees-district court discretion.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Crago [R] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] | Rep. Tony Niemiec [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] |
Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Affie Ellis [R] | Sen. Dan Furphy [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-12-4-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Assigned Chapter Number 148 | |
2023-03-02 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0074 | |
2023-02-28 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0074 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0074 |
2023-02-28 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0074 | |
2023-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 46-12-4-0-0 |
2023-02-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-22 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-20 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |