WY SF0108 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 163 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to civil procedure; specifying the properly named party for actions challenging legislative acts; providing for removal of incorrect names; providing legislative findings; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lawsuits challenging state legislative acts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 12-0-1-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08 Chapter No. 163 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-08 Governor Signed SEA No. 0070
2017-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0070
2017-03-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0070
2017-03-01 Assigned Number SEA No. 0070
2017-03-01SenateConcur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2017-02-28SenateReceived for Concurrence
2017-02-28House3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0
2017-02-27House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2017-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-23HouseH12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 12-0-1-0-0
2017-02-03HouseIntroduced and Referred to H12 - Rules
2017-01-30HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-26Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2017-01-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-24SenateCOW:Passed
2017-01-23SenatePlaced on General File
2017-01-23SenateS12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced and Referred to S12 - Rules
2017-01-20SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-19 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback