WY SF0107 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to pari-mutuel wagering; providing for distribution of fees to the state fair account as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pari-mutuel fee distribution-state fair account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 163
2019-02-28 Governor Signed SEA No. 0060
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0060
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0060
2019-02-25 Assigned Number SEA No. 0060
2019-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-13HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-13HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28Senate3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0
2019-01-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-24SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-23SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-23SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback