WY SF0106 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxes and fees; requiring audits before the imposition or increase of any tax or fee; requiring reports of audits; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New taxes-audit requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 0-5-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-01-25SenateS05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 0-5-0-0-0
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback