WY SF0106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxes and fees; requiring audits before the imposition or increase of any tax or fee; requiring reports of audits; and providing for an effective date.
Title
New taxes-audit requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 0-5-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-25 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 0-5-0-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |