WY SF0106 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 179 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to government record keeping and reporting; amending and repealing local child protection agency reporting and record keeping obligations; amending and repealing department of family services reporting and record keeping obligations; amending the governor's obligation to require annual program plans from human service agencies; amending state agency plan reporting requirements; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Obsolete reporting requirements-repeal and modification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08 Chapter No. 179 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-08 Governor Signed SEA No. 0076
2017-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0076
2017-03-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0076
2017-03-01 Assigned Number SEA No. 0076
2017-03-01House3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
2017-02-28House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-27HouseCOW:Passed
2017-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-14HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2017-01-30HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-26Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2017-01-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-24SenateCOW:Passed
2017-01-23SenatePlaced on General File
2017-01-23SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-01-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2017-01-19SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback