WY SF0106 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public education; providing for a process to address a 2014 Supreme Court decision relating to the structure and oversight of the state's public school system; requiring a legislative study; providing for the delegation of powers and duties relating to the administration of the state's school system; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State education administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S12 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S12 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S12 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Reconsidered (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Failed Introduction (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S12 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Reconsidered (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Failed Introduction (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S12 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S12 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S12 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Reconsidered (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Failed Introduction (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S12 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Reconsidered (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Failed Introduction (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2014-02-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-28 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-28 | House | Rereferred to H02 |
2014-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 |
2014-02-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Failed | |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Failed | |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Failed | |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Amendment Failed | |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to S02 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Failed Introduction |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |