WY SF0105 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; creating the game and fish wildlife round up program; providing for agreements between the game and fish commission and retail businesses for the collection of donations as specified; providing restrictions; providing for rulemaking; creating an account; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Game and fish-round up program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 | |
2015-03-04 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2015-02-03 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-29 | Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |