WY SF0104 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the legislature; amending provisions relating to the selection of a management council member at large; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Management council membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-27 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-24 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 26-3-1-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |