WY SF0104 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 200
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to courts; creating a chancery court; providing for jurisdiction; providing for funding of the chancery court; providing for adoption of rules for the chancery court; providing for the terms and appointment of chancery court judges; providing for the salary and expenses of chancery court personnel; authorizing positions; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming chancery court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Assigned Chapter Number 200
2019-03-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0076
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0076
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0076
2019-02-27 Assigned Number SEA No. 0076
2019-02-27SenateConcur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2019-02-27SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-20HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-02-15House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-02-15HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-02-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0
2019-02-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-31SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-28Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-28SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to {NextAssignedTo}
2019-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback