WY SF0103 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - 3rd Reading:Failed 8-51-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to administration of government; expanding the role of the select committee on school facilities to include community college and state capital construction projects; renaming the select committee; providing for the appointment of co-chairmen; authorizing additional temporary members of the committee; specifying the expanded duties of the committee; repealing requirements for quarterly meetings and selection of chairman and vice-chairman; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State capital construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 8-51-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27House3rd Reading:Failed 8-51-1-0-0
2019-02-26House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-20HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0
2019-01-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-22SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-18SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-18SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback