WY SF0102 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to cooperative utilities; specifying how unclaimed refunds due members of cooperative utilities shall be used if unclaimed; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unclaimed cooperative utility deposits and payments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 21-8-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06 Assigned Chapter Number 127
2021-04-06 Governor Signed SEA No. 0048
2021-04-02HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0048
2021-04-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0048
2021-04-01 Assigned Number SEA No. 0048
2021-04-01SenateConcur:Passed 21-8-1-0-0
2021-04-01SenateReceived for Concurrence
2021-03-31House3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0
2021-03-30House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-29HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-24HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-24HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2021-03-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2021-03-11HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-03-11Senate3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0
2021-03-10Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-09SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-04SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-04SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2021-03-01SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2021-02-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-02-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0102
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/SF0102.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Engross/SF0102.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Enroll/SF0102.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0102SS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0102SW001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0102S3001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0102H2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0102H2002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0102H3001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/SF0102.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Summaries/SF0102.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0102#-319
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0102#257
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0102#-655
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0102#5335
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0102#442

Bill Comments 750

feedback