WY SF0101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to wages; authorizing an employer to offset employee wages related to theft or damage caused by the employee as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wage offset for employee theft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21Housepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-11HouseH03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2019-02-04Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-01SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-30SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback