WY SF0100 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the business ready community program; amending requirements for grants and loans under the program; providing for the recapture of funds associated with grants and loans under the program; removing a restriction on interest rates for loans; making conforming amendments; requiring rulemaking; specifying applicability; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Business ready community program-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 21-8-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 21-8-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2020-02-20 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 21-8-1-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |